California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB322 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2021

Amended

Bill August 18, 2021
Bill June 24, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021