|
10/08/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 41. Noes 30. Page 2927.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 2284.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 27. Page 1905.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1688.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 1688.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2021
|
Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Gray.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2021
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 38. Noes 27. Page 1434.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|