California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB333 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill July 13, 2021
Bill May 28, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021
Bill March 24, 2021