|
10/08/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 700, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3025.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2499.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 1283.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|