California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB335 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill September 3, 2021
Bill March 26, 2021