|
09/27/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 312, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 2779.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 2778.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 2338.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 1592.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/07/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|