California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB37 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2021

Amended

Bill August 26, 2021
Bill July 14, 2021
Bill July 1, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021