|
09/23/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 227, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 12. Page 2982.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2496.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2021
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on ED., E.Q. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 16. Page 1407.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (March 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/07/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|