California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB39 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2021

Amended

Bill September 1, 2021
Bill August 26, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021