|
07/16/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 91, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1805.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 962.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|