California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB419 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill July 6, 2021

Chaptered

Bill July 16, 2021

Amended

Bill March 25, 2021
Bill March 9, 2021