Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hueso.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (September 7)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 (b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 (b).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1719.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2021
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W., GOV. & F. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 1632.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
Received by the Desk April 30 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1142.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|