California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB500 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2021

Amended

Bill August 31, 2021
Bill July 13, 2021
Bill June 30, 2021
Bill June 21, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021