Assembly
|
09/29/2022
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 45. Noes 22.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Kamlager.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1721.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 22. Page 1072.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 1064.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Stone.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 22. Page 966.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|