California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB503 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Amended

Bill August 4, 2022
Bill June 28, 2022
Bill August 18, 2021
Bill June 17, 2021