Assembly
|
02/07/2022
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/04/2021
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2903.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2875.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2464.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1067.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|