California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB515 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2021

Amended

Bill September 2, 2021
Bill August 16, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021