|
09/24/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 281, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3156.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2620.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2233.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Motion to reconsider made by Senator Dahle.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2226.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2021
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1605.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|