California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB516 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2021

Amended

Bill September 3, 2021
Bill June 22, 2021