|
10/07/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 620, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3077.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3063.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2580.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1529.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1464.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|