California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB583 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2021

Amended

Bill September 3, 2021
Bill May 20, 2021