|
09/24/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 295, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2728.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2295.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1822.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|