California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB600 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2021

Amended

Bill June 17, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021