|
09/28/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 347, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2905.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2875.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2457.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1607.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|