California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB602 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2021

Amended

Bill August 26, 2021
Bill July 5, 2021
Bill May 4, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021