|
09/28/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2992.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2494.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 15. Page 1539.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|