California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB634 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2021

Amended

Bill August 31, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021