|
10/06/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 584, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2461.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1908.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1153.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|