California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB638 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2021

Amended

Bill July 6, 2021
Bill March 26, 2021
Bill March 11, 2021