Assembly
|
02/07/2022
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/04/2021
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 9. Page 2824.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2336.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1694.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 11. Page 1590.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/07/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|