California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB73 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2021

Amended

Bill September 3, 2021
Bill August 26, 2021
Bill July 8, 2021
Bill June 29, 2021
Bill June 28, 2021
Bill May 24, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021
Bill February 2, 2021