|
09/22/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 199, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 2733.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 2287.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 1716.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 5. Page 1429.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|