California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB746 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2021

Amended

Bill June 14, 2021
Bill May 5, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021