|
10/06/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 587, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2562.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 2091.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1405.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|