Assembly
|
02/03/2022
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/08/2021
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2117.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1695.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1779.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|