|
09/22/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 200, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2510.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2072.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1154.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|