California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB784 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2021

Amended

Bill July 5, 2021
Bill June 16, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021