California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB807 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2021

Amended

Bill August 16, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021