|
10/08/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 669, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2738.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2289.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2021
|
Measure version as amended on June 23 corrected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1337.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|