California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB824 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill June 23, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021