Assembly
|
09/29/2022
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 10.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 31).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 60. Noes 16.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 4954.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2022
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Limón.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 1649.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|