California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB826 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Amended

Bill August 3, 2022
Bill August 31, 2021
Bill July 14, 2021
Bill June 22, 2021
Bill June 21, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021