|
09/18/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 401, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5234.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2022
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., E., U. & C. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 3343.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2022
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2022
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Quirk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Quirk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|