California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB847 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2022

Amended

Bill August 22, 2022
Bill June 20, 2022
Bill May 31, 2022
Bill May 24, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021