|
09/24/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 283, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2509.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2039.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1182.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|