Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1772.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|