|
10/04/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 472, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 2117.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 10. Page 1773.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
Received by the Desk April 30 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|