California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB890 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2021

Amended

Bill May 24, 2021
Bill March 11, 2021