|
09/23/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 475, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5365.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3438.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|