California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB923 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2022

Amended

Bill August 22, 2022
Bill August 11, 2022
Bill June 21, 2022
Bill January 24, 2022